Trustees HEALS OF MALMESBURY

Charity number: 1167780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GAVIN GRANT Chair 01 June 2014
FRIENDS OF WESTONBIRT ARBORETUM
Received: On time
Janet Mary Snedden Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Paul David Overton Trustee 26 January 2020
None on record
Karen Franklin Trustee 12 February 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Cook Trustee 14 February 2018
None on record
Guy Davies Trustee 15 November 2016
None on record
RICHARD JOHN DODRIDGE Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record