FRIENDS OF JOHN DONNE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1163590
Charity reporting is overdue by 1723 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 262 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 262 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 628 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 628 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 993 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 993 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1358 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1358 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1723 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1723 days