Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARTIN'S ACADEMY

Charity number: 1163877
Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5.84k £5.71k £4.22k £3.31k £0
Total expenditure £11.93k £6.23k £2.89k £3.20k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A