ALL SAINTS UNDER FIVES PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At All Saints Under Fives we strive to make a difference. We hope to set free children's original ideas and follow the children not only the plans. We give ideas and choices, we observe and evaluate the children's ideas and watch them grow. We try to be their constancy, someone to turn to. We listen and want to contribute to their wellbeing, protect them and above all develop their independence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £82,308 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 September 2015: CIO registration
- 01 March 2017: Funds received from 1069684 ALL SAINTS UNDER FIVES (NEWMARKET) PRE-SCHOOL PLAY...
- ASUF (Working name)
- ALL SAINTS UNDER FIVES (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Tofa Otule | Chair | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sinead Mathias-Madeiros | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Dudgeon | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Margaret Wood | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.88k | £101.82k | £59.19k | £85.19k | £100.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.34k | £77.46k | £85.20k | £77.89k | £92.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £83.24k | £96.88k | £7.12k | N/A | £82.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS UNDER FIVES
REAR OF ALL SAINTS' SCHOOL
VICARAGE ROAD
NEWMARKET
SUFFOLK
CB8 8JE
- Phone:
- 01638561617
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window