Financial history INVOLVE LEEDS

Charity number: 1166340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £186.12k £104.24k £105.90k £90.24k £219.69k
Total expenditure £142.49k £106.47k £130.15k £141.85k £136.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A