HEPWORTH UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1163904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £170.08k £421.51k £383.39k £130.96k £98.70k
Total expenditure £26.41k £43.12k £416.05k £138.13k £90.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £15.00k