Accounts and annual returns ST. YARED'S TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1164803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 September 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 09 September 2019 14 July 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 09 September 2018 06 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 09 September 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2017 06 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 September 2016 06 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2016 Not Required