Accounts and annual returns MASONIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window