THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS ALCESTER WARWICKSHIRE

Charity number: 1164101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Katie Louise Cross Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
Marion Ivy Deeks Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
Mary Elizabeth Titterington Trustee 10 April 2019 None on record
Michael Andrew Lister Trustee 10 April 2019 None on record
Christopher George Wright Trustee 19 August 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Jane Humphrey Trustee 15 July 2020 None on record
Loretta Anne Clayton Trustee 10 April 2019 None on record
CAROLINE MARY RUSSELL NEWEY Trustee 12 April 2000 None on record
ELIZABETH CATHERINE DAVEY Trustee 13 April 2016 None on record
JULIE LINDSAY Trustee 14 April 2009 None on record
Brian Neville Titterington Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
Christine Ann Dean Stanton Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
MICHAEL JOHN NEWEY Trustee 12 April 2000 None on record
RUTH JANET PROCTER Trustee 19 April 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Anne Calder Trustee 10 April 2019 None on record
ANDREW GERALD DEEKS Trustee 13 April 2016 None on record