HARROGATE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The free provision for the registered blind or partially sighted of recordings of a weekly talking newspaper with local news, a monthly talking magazine with topics of interest and a talking books library service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 November 1977: Standard registration
- ROUNDABOUT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS HANNAH BECK | Chair | 18 May 2018 |
|
|||||
David James Foley | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|||||
ANGELA CAROLYN MUIR RICHMOND | Trustee | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.92k | £6.20k | £6.44k | £9.03k | £7.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.37k | £3.72k | £9.20k | £6.96k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 FEBRUARY 1977 AMENDED 4 OCTOBER 1978 AND 2 NOVEMBER 1979 AND 29 APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAY 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ASSIST THE REGISTERED BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT DISABILITY OF SIGHT WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, PRINCIPALLY BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDINGS OF LOCAL NEWSPAPER EXTRACTS AND OTHER RECORDED MATERIAL OF INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ST. MARYS AVENUE
HARROGATE
HG2 0LP
- Phone:
- 01423564942
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window