Accounts and annual returns DEAN BANK & FERRYHILL LITERARY INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1164696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window