Accounts and annual returns WORCESTER MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (CIO)

Charity number: 1166931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window