Trustees WORCESTER MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (CIO)

Charity number: 1166931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL YORKE GRIFFITH MBE Chair 02 June 1984
THE KATHMANDU CHILDREN'S TRUST CIO
Received: On time
CITIZENS ADVICE WORCESTER AND HEREFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
Alan Tidy Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Jonathan Newey Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Jennifer Barnes Trustee 04 November 2020
THE HOPMARKET CHARITY
Received: On time
Richard Boorn Trustee 02 November 2016
THE ARMCHAIR TRUST CIO
Received: On time
THE THOMAS CORBETT CHARITY FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED
Received: On time
Geraint Thomas Trustee 23 August 2016
None on record
ROGER KNIGHT Trustee 24 September 2014
WORCESTER NEWS AND EQUIPMENT SERVICES FOR THE BLIND (WNESB)
Received: On time
BATTLE OF WORCESTER SOCIETY CHARITY
Received: On time
ST PETER'S VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
RON RUST Trustee 30 November 2011
None on record
MEL KIRK Trustee 28 September 2011
None on record
MARGARET PANTER Trustee 29 April 2009
THE WORCESTER HERITAGE AND AMENITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
GRAHAM HUGHES Trustee 28 March 2007
HOME-START SOUTH WORCESTERSHIRE
Received: On time
CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS WORCESTERSHIRE
Received: On time
PAUL DENHAM JP Trustee 26 August 2005
WORCESTER ROTARY CLUB SAWYER TRUST
Received: On time
WORCESTER CITY PARISH RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
SUE OSBORNE Trustee 02 March 2003
MAGGS DAY CENTRE
Received: On time
MARTYN SAUNDERS Trustee 25 October 2000
None on record
MARGARET JONES Trustee 28 February 1996
JOHN PALMER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ARMCHAIR TRUST CIO
Received: On time
COLLAR AND TIE LIMITED
Received: On time
BRENDA SHERIDAN Trustee 26 September 1990
HALLOW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Overdue by 217 days
JOHN PALMER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Roger Edward Berry Trustee 25 March 1987
None on record