SPONDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Spondon Village Hall, improve the general appearance of the village through our sub-committee - the Village Improvement Committee (VIC), and provide a focus for issues appertaining to the village and taking appropriate action as necessary, mainly through liaison with the City Council's Neighourhood Board.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
Governance
- 18 November 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Alexander Inwood | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Winslow | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Reg Pugh | Trustee | 01 January 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.69k | £37.59k | £53.01k | £40.25k | £60.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.14k | £51.58k | £40.20k | £53.03k | £75.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/09/1977 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2012 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
SPONDON AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HALL
SITWELL STREET
SPONDON
DERBY
DE21 7FG
- Phone:
- 01332674073
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
spondonca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window