Trustees KINGTON LANGLEY VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CIO
Charity Number: 1165128

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY SHEPHERD | Chair | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham Richard Watson | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Olwen Tayler | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Geoffrey Collins MRICS | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Michael Hickman | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelvina Anne Gosling | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Charles Tanner | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Warren Derick Burgess | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER WILLMOTT GILES OBE MA PHD | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN AINSLIE MORRISON | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDY BOULTON | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MARIE COOK | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE ELLEN POVEY | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANITA LOUISE HOLBROOK | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.