HILLDROP AREA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1164597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Satnam Gill Trustee 03 October 2017 None on record
sarah martin Trustee 11 November 2018 None on record
Victor Olayebo Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
Geraldine Brennan Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
BRIAN BENCH Trustee 19 June 2014
THE FILM AND VIDEO WORKSHOP Received: 5 days late
EAST LONDON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS Received: On time
Adekunbi Jones Trustee 09 October 2018 None on record
Stephen Moorby Chair 19 September 2017 None on record
Tricia Clarke Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Anjit Chaundhuri Trustee 05 July 2016 None on record
Marissa Campbell Trustee 05 July 2016 None on record
Charlene Braithwaite Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record