SOUTHPORT GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 1163781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £30.25k £549.52k £502.17k £510.12k £412.02k
Total expenditure £11.46k £361.14k £355.19k £431.84k £349.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £29.72k £51.24k £30.67k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £52.85k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £434.77k £400.47k £426.60k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £85.04k £50.46k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £296.86k £262.84k £336.01k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £30.16k £25.37k £6.42k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £34.12k £66.98k £89.42k N/A