ASHFORD MODEL RAILWAY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing model railways to the community for learning, wellbeing and fun. Promoting education and personal development through research, planning, building, operation and display of model railways. Collaborative engagement with local heritage organisations to promote social and industrial history. Develop permanent museum and education centre to display heritage model railway assets & artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 15 August 2016: Standard registration
- AIMREC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BECK | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frederick James William Garner | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
HARRY ERNEST MAYNARD | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR CLIFF PARSONS | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUPERT DAVID EDWARD BROWN | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.62k | £61.75k | £34.36k | £34.96k | £61.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £6.15k | £12.01k | £16.36k | £37.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUN 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY DESIGNING, BUILDING AND OPERATING A MUSEUM AND EDUCATION CENTRE FOCUSSING ON MODEL RAILWAYS AND INCORPORATING: - DISPLAYS OF HISTORIC MODEL RAILWAY LAYOUTS AND ARTEFACTS IN THEIR INDUSTRIAL, ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL CONTEXTS; - ASSOCIATED EXHIBITS AND FACILITIES CONNECTING MODEL RAILWAYS WITH THE EQUIVALENT FEATURES OF ACTUAL RAILWAYS; - EDUCATION AND TRAINING FACILITIES RELATING TO THE ARTISTIC, TECHNICAL AND ENGINEERING SKILLS ASSOCIATED WITH MODEL RAILWAYS; AND - EXHIBITS DEMONSTRATING THE ROLE PLAYED BY THE TOWN OF ASHFORD IN THE HISTORY OF THE RAILWAYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
Mill Farm Business Units
Fridd Lane
Bethersden
ASHFORD
Kent
- Phone:
- 01233333877
- Email:
- friends@aimrec.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window