DOMINION CITY (MODEL) CHURCH

Charity number: 1165263
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings lectures public celebration of religious festivals producing and distributing literature on Christian faith to enlighten others about the Christian religion. The prevention or relief of poverty in by providing grants items and services to individuals in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £300
Total expenditure: £300

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 January 2016: CIO registration
  • 29 July 2021: Removed (Administrative dissolution under consideration)
  • 29 July 2021: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £300
Total expenditure £100 £100 £100 £300
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 February 2020 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 February 2020 96 days late
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 February 2020 461 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 February 2020 461 days late