MANCHESTER YOUTH ACADEMY LTD

Charity number: 1164599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 04 May 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 04 May 2020 4 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 July 2019 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 July 2019 86 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 17 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 March 2017 On time Download