Financial history MORTON ON SWALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1163881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.49k £6.19k £7.11k £20.45k £10.67k
Total expenditure £6.23k £4.07k £5.50k £3.01k £4.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £19.43k £8.00k