Financial history THE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION OF ST ANDREWS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1164041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £10.01k £7.73k £9.59k £3.59k £5.83k
Total expenditure £9.17k £7.77k £6.00k £7.56k £2.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A