HEART FIRE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship services, Faith counselling: encouraging/ counselling who are situated in spiritual, psychological and physical difficulties. Visiting the wounded and ones who are weak spiritually, psychologically and physically for the sake of hearing their difficulties, and advising them with the bible message regularly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
- Newport City
- Throughout London
- South Korea
Governance
- 16 February 2016: CIO registration
- ST LUKE'S CHURCH, NEWPORT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Donnelly | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA CRAWFORD | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JU YEOUNG KIM | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev YOUNG HWAN KIM DOCTOR | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.89k | £21.73k | £61.44k | £53.13k | £35.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.15k | £28.15k | £64.92k | £53.00k | £36.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 FEB 2016 AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN NEWPORT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 St. Andrews Crescent
CARDIFF
CF10 3DD
- Phone:
- 07975613584
- Email:
- shemikim3@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window