Accounts and annual returns SUPPORT FOR SURVIVORS

Charity number: 1165986
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window