Trustees SUPPORT FOR SURVIVORS

Charity number: 1165986
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEREMY WILLIAM TAYLOR Chair 01 August 2015
None on record
Ginette Smedley Trustee 18 January 2022
None on record
Ricky Weaver Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Debbie Heath LLB Trustee 04 February 2019
None on record
Danielle Harris BA ACMA Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
CHRISTINE GIBBON B.ED. Trustee 01 April 2016
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE MINING MUSEUM LTD
Received: On time
JOSEPH CURTIS Trustee 13 October 2015
None on record
MAXINE ANNE ROBINSON CERTED Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record