LYTHAM SPORTS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1164629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.83k £10.86k £1.96k £2.50k £265
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A