NASRUL-LAHI-IL-FATIH DAGENHAM UK LTD

Charity number: 1167402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2020 23 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 23 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 August 2019 13 July 2020 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2018 05 July 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required