Accounts and annual returns STOCKPORT UNIT 318 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 506976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 781 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 July 2019 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required