CHESTERFIELD CHURCH OF THE CROOKED SPIRE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds and apply them for the maintenances of the Parochial Church of St Mary and All Saints Chesterfield, only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 31 January 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Venerable Carol Ann Coslett | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MALCOLM WILKINSON | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|||||
COLIN MCKENNA | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Patrick Francis Coleman | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|||||
SHEILA MARY BARRETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.55k | £4.12k | £0 | £27.38k | £330 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.64k | £163.35k | £21.50k | £6.16k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/10/1977
Charitable objects
1) THE RESTORATION AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHESTERFIELD PARISH CHURCH. 2) THE PRESERVATION OF THE CHESTERFIELD PARISH CHURCH'S TREAURES AND GENERAL IMPROVEMENTS TO THE CHESTERFIELD PARISH CHURCH. 3) THE REPAYMENT OF SUMS BORROWED AND APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHESTERFIELD PARISH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST MARY AND ALL SAINTS, CHESTERFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary & All Saints Church
Church Way
CHESTERFIELD
S40 1XJ
- Phone:
- 01246 206506
- Email:
- contact@crookedspire.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window