Accounts and annual returns TRENT DISTRICT COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1165203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 May 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 27 May 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 May 2017 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2017 Not Required