Trustees TRENT DISTRICT COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1165203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Christopher Smart Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Grace Fielding Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
OLIVER FURNISS Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
MATTHEW AKERS Trustee 15 June 2019
None on record
MRS Nikki Walker Trustee 02 June 2018
None on record
MR Andy Stephens Trustee 28 May 2015
None on record