LOVE WITHINGTON BATHS

Charity number: 1167366
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 April 2020 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 April 2020 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 June 2018 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 June 2018 128 days late Download