Accounts and annual returns TNC UK FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1167674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 24 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 May 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 May 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window