BLYTH COMMUNITY ROWING CLUB

Charity number: 1164860
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 597 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 January 2018 On time Download