Trustees BUTTERFLIES - HAVEN

Charity number: 1168333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADRIAN INKER Chair 01 September 2014
COMMUNITY AT 67
Received: On time
Callum Lee Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Grace Elizabeth O'Hara Trustee 28 October 2019
None on record
George Pittaway Trustee 28 October 2019
None on record
Joan Liley Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
keith Burchell Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
CHRIS O'HARA Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record