Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S RC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA CHORLTON

Charity number: 1166215
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 November 2020 27 September 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 November 2019 06 November 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required