THE PAUL COTTINGHAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding and supporting organisation pursuing the aims and objectives of the Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 February 2016: Standard registration
- PAUL'S TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Hogarth | Chair | 16 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Thomas Corcoran | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wheatley | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORD MICHAEL MAURICE CASHMAN CBE | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA BOWCOCK | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/10/2020 | 24/10/2021 | 24/10/2022 | 24/10/2023 | 24/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.77k | £33.14k | £40.45k | £34.48k | £86.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.22k | £31.49k | £46.50k | £47.07k | £49.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 October 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 October 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 October 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 October 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 October 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, THROUGH THE AWARDING OF GRANTS TO ORGANIZATIONS (INCLUDING CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS) WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES WHO ARE: (I) WORKING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION AND INEQUALITY ON THE BASIS OF AN INDIVIDUAL'S SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES RELATING TO SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, AND DISCRIMINATION IN CONNECTION THEREOF; (III) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER AN UNDERSTANDING IN RELATION TO ISSUES SURROUNDING SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY; (IV) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY OR DIVERSITY IN RELATION TO ISSUES SURROUNDING SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND (V) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN RELATION TO PERSONS WHO IDENTIFY AS LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER, OR INTERSEX. (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF PERSON'S LIVES, THROUGH THE AWARDING OF GRANTS TO ORGANIZATIONS (INCLUDING CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS) WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES WHO ARE CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT AND ERADICATION OF CANCERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ANGIOSARCOMA. (C) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THROUGH THE AWARDING OF GRANTS TO PERSONS (AND ORGANIZATIONS, INCLUDING CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS, WORKING WITH SUCH PERSONS) WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES WHO THEMSELVES (OR WHOSE FAMILIES) ARE FACING FINANCIAL OR OTHER HARDSHIP DURING THEIR TREATMENT RESULTING FROM A DIAGNOSIS OF CANCER, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ANGIOSARCOMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
94 Narrow Street
London
E14 8BP
- Phone:
- 02075372092
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window