THE NOTTINGHAM IRISH CENTRE

Charity number: 1165907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download