COVENTRY MIGRANT WOMENS HOUSES

Charity number: 1168441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.32k £17.00k £6.81k £17.78k £13.11k
Total expenditure £7.49k £16.32k £8.97k £13.53k £17.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A