AID TO THE BALKANS UK (A2B)

Charity number: 1168468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download