Blind Active Limited

Charity number: 1168987
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 17 February 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 08 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download