MINISTERY THE GLORY OF SHADDAI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Glory of the Shaddai is a religious entity, Evangelical Protestant Church, we help the spiritual life of the people by teaching the Bible, we also teach young people music classes and we do different activities for families, for young people and children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 May 2016: CIO registration
- B4E84PKW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jaramillo Galeano | Trustee | 02 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MS CLAUDIA GALEANO | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deyanira Puente Perea | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.41k | £71.91k | £55.00k | £73.46k | £63.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.76k | £63.73k | £63.73k | £73.71k | £61.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.64k | £18.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 25 June 2024 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 25 June 2024 | 360 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 08 October 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 08 October 2021 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 May 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONGST SPANISH SPEAKING COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE GREATER LONDON AREA IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 BRITANNIA CLOSE
LONDON
SW4 7NN
- Phone:
- 07984943463
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window