WYTHENSHAWE FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1165044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 03 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 03 April 2018 09 September 2019 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2018 09 September 2019 218 days late Download
Annual return 03 April 2017 14 February 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2017 25 April 2018 81 days late Download