Accounts and annual returns ST.GREGORIOS JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, WATFORD, NORTH LONDON, ENGLAND

Charity number: 1165219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window