Financial history ST.GREGORIOS JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, WATFORD, NORTH LONDON, ENGLAND

Charity number: 1165219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £58.30k £50.95k £76.78k £96.80k £28.54k
Total expenditure £19.66k £20.07k £27.52k £29.98k £7.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A