Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE BENEFICE OF ST STEPHEN'S, GATEACRE

Charity number: 1164672
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 December 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 December 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 December 2022 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 December 2022 415 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 March 2020 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 March 2020 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 February 2019 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 February 2019 97 days late Download Open in new window