MAHAMEVNAWA MEDITATION CENTER UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Using the religion as a vehicle to meditate the public to stop the mind rushing about in an aimless stream of thoughts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEMBUKUTTI ARACHCHILAGE DE SILVA | Chair | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BATEWELA VIDANALAGE INDIKA HEMANTHA PREMARTHNA | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDIRISINGHE MUDIYANSELAGE AMILA SANJEEWA EDIRISINGHE | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.93k | £34.54k | £85.86k | £55.43k | £43.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.33k | £28.18k | £40.43k | £43.61k | £56.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE THERAVADA BUDDHIST RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF BUDDHIST FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Coronation Drive
WIDNES
Cheshire
WA8 8AY
- Phone:
- 07818305734
- Email:
- info@mahamevnawamc.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window