GREAT DENHAM COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1166224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 06 September 2017 On time