GREAT DENHAM COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1166224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £16.74k £80.74k £89.35k £98.51k £78.53k
Total expenditure £23.28k £67.06k £83.05k £88.98k £63.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £27.00k £40.14k