GREAT DENHAM COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1166224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir William Sinclair Chair 26 November 2019 None on record
Katie Meredith Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
Samuel Ancliff Trustee 10 September 2019 None on record
RACHEL SMITH Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
JIM WEIR Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
Robert Tansey Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record
Samantha Swann Mrs Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record
GEMMA DILLEY Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
Donna Louise Parsons Trustee 10 April 2019 None on record